+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 441
- Effective date(s) 05/16/2013
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 59, Nays 32
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 26, Nays 0
- Conf. comm. appointed. (Carter, M. Hill, Mitchell)
- H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/19/2013
- Conf. comm. appointed. (Watson, Green, Harper)
- S. refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 25 of 0 - HA0586)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 17 of 0 - HA0532)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 23 of 0 - HA0583)
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 24 of 0 - HA0585)
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/18/2013
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA0464)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 78, Nays 16
- S. refused to concur in am. 17, 23, 24, 25
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/19/2013
- H. refused to recede from am. no. 17, 23, 24, 25
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 9 - SA0486)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 13 of 0 - SA0502)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Failed to adopt am. 12, Ayes 9, Nays 22
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 7 - SA0484)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 11 - SA0497)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 10 - SA0487)
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 16 - HA0523)
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. 8 tabled
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/17/2013
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA0471)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0398)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0341)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 4 of 0 - SA0478)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 5 - SA0477)
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 6 of 0 - SA0483)
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/17/2013
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2013
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2013
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/10/2013
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2013
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/2/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (13)
SA0502
Amendment 13-0 to SB0279
SA0486
Amendment 9-0 to SB0279
SA0487
Amendment 10-0 to SB0279
SA0497
Amendment 11-0 to SB0279
SA0501
Amendment 12-0 to SB0279
SA0483
Amendment 6-0 to SB0279
SA0485
Amendment 8-0 to SB0279
SA0484
Amendment 7-0 to SB0279
SA0398
Amendment 2-0 to SB0279
SA0471
Amendment 3-0 to SB0279
SA0477
Amendment 5-0 to SB0279
SA0478
Amendment 4-0 to SB0279
SA0341
Amendment 1-0 to SB0279
+ − Votes (10)
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 39
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 32
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO DEFER MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 52
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 16
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 8 BY Finney L
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
April 17, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 12 BY Johnson
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 22
April 17, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 27
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 6 BY Dickerson
- Yeas: 28
April 2, 2013: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor