+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 108
- Effective date(s) 04/07/2017
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 67, Nays 19, PNV 4
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 3/27/2017
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0028)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0015)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/23/2017
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 2/23/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/16/2017
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/14/2017
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 19
February 23, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
February 14, 2017: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
February 14, 2017: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor