+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pr. Ch. 36
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 3
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor