+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018
- Senate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
- Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
March 28, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor