+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 796
- Effective date(s) 04/20/2018
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 3, PNV 3
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/26/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 3
March 26, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 20, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 20, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor