+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 431
- Effective date(s) 05/18/2015; 01/01/2016
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 5 - HA0492)
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0230)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0431)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA0432)
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 3 calendar for 4/22/2015
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0430)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 52, Nays 43, PNV 0
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 25, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0230)
- Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 0 (Amendment 3 - HA0431)
- Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 0 (Amendment 4 - HA0432)
- Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 0 (Amendment 5 - HA0492)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0134)
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0449)
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 3
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 1
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/7/2015
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/1/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means until 4/1/2015
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/18/2015
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (11)
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 43
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 43
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 3
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 4
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 5
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 1
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 1
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 18, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 18, 2015: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9