+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/6/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/27/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor