+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed In S. S&L Govt. Comm. Ayes 3, Nays 5 PNV 0
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Gov. Comm.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/26/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/19/2013
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/12/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 4/19/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/12/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
March 18, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor