+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 222
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/10/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/3/2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/27/2019
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2019: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 2, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
March 12, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 8
March 10, 2015: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 25, 2015: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor