+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 43
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/31/2016
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 31, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor