+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 34
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/21/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
March 21, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor