+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 1059
- Effective date(s) 04/28/2016
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 1
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1188)
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/14/2016
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee2 calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee2 calendar for 4/12/2016
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 14, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
April 14, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 10
April 13, 2016: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 10