+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pr. Ch. 84
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C held on desk. Local Bill
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor