+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 766
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. C&L Comm. 3/20/18
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/14/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, & Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
March 14, 2018: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor