+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 709
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/3/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (29)
White
Type:
Primary Sponsor