+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 795
- Effective date(s) 04/20/2018
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 74, Nays 10, PNV 3
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0761)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0944)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/2/18
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/6/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 10
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 10
March 13, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 10