+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 947
- Effective date(s) 05/15/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 3, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1171)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA1071)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2018
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/5/2018
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
April 11, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 27, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 27, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor