+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pr. Ch. 57
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB subst.
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C held on desk. Local Bill
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
April 14, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 29