+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 917
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. 3 tabled
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1149)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 cal. for 4/10/2014
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. F,W&M Comm.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 9, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 11