+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 1
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0081)
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2019
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/9/2019
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/6/2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/27/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
April 9, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 6, 2019: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor