+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 1056
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 65, Nays 26, PNV 1
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0759)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0721)
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/8/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
April 19, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
April 18, 2016: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 8, 2016: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor