+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 37
- Effective date(s) 03/27/2015
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0
- Am. withdrawn.
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Amendment 1
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/2/2015
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/25/2015
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 2/25/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/18/2015
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 19, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 2, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2015: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2015: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor