+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 926
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/31/2022
- Senate Reset on calendar for 3/31/2022
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/30/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/23/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to next calendar
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 23, 2022: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor