+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor