+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 709
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- S. concurred in H. am. 1
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 3/27/2014
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 1
- H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0912)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0828)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/17/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/12/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0828
Amendment 1-0 to SB2558
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 31
March 24, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 32
March 12, 2014: S. C&L COMM.
- Yeas: 9