+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/25/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/18/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor