+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1061
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 calendar for 4/18/2018
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (14)
+ − Vote
April 17, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor