+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 745
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/21/2016
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/16/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 6
February 16, 2016: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor