+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/19/2014
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/12/2014
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor