+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
- Pub. Ch. 923
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0865)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0533)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/14/2022
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
March 14, 2022: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 9
March 1, 2022: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor