+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 1054
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1217)
- Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA1131)
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016
- Senate Reset on message calendar for 4/20/2016
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2016
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed H. as amended, Ayes 83, Nays 6, PNV 0
- H. adopted am. 2 - (HA1217)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2016
- Reset on next avail. cal.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2016
- Reset on cal. for 4/18/2016
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1131)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/21/2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1
- Yeas: 9
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2
- Yeas: 9
April 19, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 51
April 11, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 51
March 21, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 9
March 15, 2016: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor