+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 746
- Effective date(s) 04/18/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 89
March 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
March 13, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 13, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor