+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date(s) 04/27/2016
- Pub. Ch. 1000
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0901)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0949)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1208)
- Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2016
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2016
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/28/2016
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Transportation Comm. 3/28/16
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
April 18, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 31
April 18, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 31
April 18, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 9
March 28, 2016: SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor