+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 638
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0804)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0642)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/8/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 15, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
March 8, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 7
February 27, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor