+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/1/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (11)
May 1, 2019: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
April 2, 2019: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 9
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
April 19, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2
- Yeas: 8
April 18, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 8
April 15, 2013: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm.
- Yeas: 8
April 9, 2013: SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M. Comm.
- Yeas: 8
May 24, 2007: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 1
May 21, 2007: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Crowe
- Yeas: 8
May 21, 2007: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 8
May 15, 2007: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm.
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor