+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1063
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2022
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2022
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022
On March 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022
- Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
March 30, 2022: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 2
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2