+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 9, 2016: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor