+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 819
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Companion House Bill substituted
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/3/2018
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/27/2018
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/20/2018
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2018
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2018
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/6/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/27/2018
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/20/2018
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2018: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
March 12, 2018: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8