+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor