+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 806
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB subst.
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
April 1, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor