+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA1174)
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1026)
- Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014
- S. Reset on Cal. for 4/16/2014
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 3 PNV 0
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/15/2014
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2014
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2014
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/1/2014
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2014: S. FW&M COMM.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
April 1, 2014: S. S&L GOVT. COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor