+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0786)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2018
- Senate Reset on calendar 4/2/18
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/13/2018
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2018
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration
- Yeas: 8
March 13, 2018: SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2018: SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor