+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed In S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Ayes 3, Nays 4 PNV 1
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources cal. for 3/12/2014
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action Def. in S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources to 3/12/2014
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources cal. for 2/26/2014
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0799
Amendment 1-0 to SB2468
+ − Vote
November 4, 2014: S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor