+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor