+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 64
- Effective date(s) 04/06/2015
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/4/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2015: SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor