+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 653
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comp. HB subst.
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/17/2014
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
March 17, 2014: S. H&W COMM.
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor