+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 312
- Effective date(s) 04/29/2013; 07/01/2014
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 2
- Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0139)
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0022)
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/25/2013
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/20/2013
- Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 2/20/2013
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 2/13/2013
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendment
SA0022
Amendment 1-0 to SB0244
+ − Votes (3)
April 15, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
February 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 31
February 20, 2013: S. H&W COMM.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor