+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 1007
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2014
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/17/2014
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for pass; ref to S. Cal. Com.
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/10/2014
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
March 17, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
March 10, 2014: S. H&W COMM.
- Yeas: 7