+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.