+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 80
- Effective date(s) 04/03/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- Subst. for comp. HB.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/13/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
March 14, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
February 21, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
February 13, 2019: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor